judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARRON V. DIXON V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Information: 11-CV-0470
Short Caption:CARRON V. DIXON V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1776-10Filed Date:04/12/2011

Opening Event Date:04/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarron Dixon NPro SeN
AppelleeAllstate Insurance CompanyN
Gene M. Thames YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/12/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 12, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3(A). (JAC) elp
05/06/2011RECORD INDEX
05/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/18/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/27/2011APPENDIX
07/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/19/2011FiledBriefing Completed
07/19/2011FiledAppendix (Appellee)
08/05/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/04/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
01/10/2012FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion for oral argument.
01/25/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, Pryor
04/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
05/22/2012FiledMandate