judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BURK ROYALTY COMPANY, CITIZENS NATIONAL BANK IN ABILENE v. BILLIE RAY RILEY

Case: B-2681
B-2681
04/16/1971
Application for Writ of Error
BURK ROYALTY COMPANY, CITIZENS NATIONAL BANK IN ABILENE
BILLIE RAY RILEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1972Reply to ResponseRespondent
02/02/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/29/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
10/18/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
05/03/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/15/1972Reply to Response
02/08/1972Response to Motion filed
02/02/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/19/1972Dissenting opinion issued.
01/19/1972Opinion issued
10/29/1971Supplemental Brief filed
10/18/1971Post submission brief filed
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/03/1971Response to Petition
04/21/1971Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
04/16/1971Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/16/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Citizens National Bank in AbilenePetitioner
Burk Royalty CompanyPetitioner
Billie Ray RileyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information