judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIERRA CLUB v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, and MEDICINE BOW FUEL & POWER, LLC

Case Heading (S-10-0105)
Case Number:S-10-0105Case Docketed On:05/10/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:SIERRA CLUB v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, and MEDICINE BOW FUEL & POWER, LLC
Full Title:SIERRA CLUB, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, and MEDICINE BOW FUEL & POWER, LLC, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSierra ClubGay George
Andrea Issod
AppelleeDepartment of Environmental QualityBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Nancy Elizabeth Vehr
AppelleeMedicine Bow Fuel & Power, LLCMary A. Throne
John Anthony Coppede

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Natural Resources
Opinion Number:2011 WY 42
Citation:251 P.3d 310

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/10/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/10/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/10/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
05/19/2010Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
07/06/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/08/2010Service - Certificate of serviceServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
07/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Statement of cost of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Certificate of serviceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2010Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Andrea Issod for Sierra ClubMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
08/16/2010Order - Pro hac vice - allow Andrea Issod to appear on behalf of Sierra ClubOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
08/23/2010Brief - Appellee - State of WyomingBriefAppelleeFinal
08/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief (State of Wyoming)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/23/2010Brief - Appellee Medicine Bow Fuel & Power, LLCBriefAppelleeFinal
08/25/2010Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
08/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Medicine Bow Fuel & Power LLC, Errata and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/10/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Nancy Vehr for DEQ.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/17/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record (one box containing 17 volumes)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mary Throne for appellee Medicine Bow Fuel & Power LLC.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Andrea Issod for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Gay George and Andrea Issod, argument by Ms. Issod for appellant; Nancy E. Vehr, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Mary A. Throne, and John A. Coppede, argument by Ms. Vehr and Ms. Throne for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/25/2011Record - Record returned to district court (Volume I). Volume II, Agency Record will be picked up by the Environmental Quality Council.RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/25/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/29/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record (Volume I) signed for 3/28/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
03/29/2011Record - Record returned to agency - receipt of record (Volume II) signed 3/29/2011.RecordRecord returned to agencyFinal