judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOYCE SAUCIER, ET AL V. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0460
Short Caption:JOYCE SAUCIER, ET AL V. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 11-CV-0297 Consolidated: 11-CV-0322 , 11-CV-0460
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1475-05Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoyce Saucier N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantKatie Carter N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantRoosevelt Hall N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantMichael Maxwell N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantTraci Hamilton N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantCarlton Wilson N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantSheleta Watts Bedney N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantAdrienne Newell Curington N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantRegina Dixon N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantEmma Pittman N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppellantBarbara Wilkerson N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
AppelleeCountrywide Home LoansN
Thomas M. HefferonNN
AppelleePresidential Bank F.S.B.N
Daniel J. TobinNY
AppelleeWashington Technology GroupN
Roger W. Heald NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL (Received NOA filed 4/19/11 amending the appealable orders)
05/03/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeals in these matters, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-460, and it further appearing that the complete records on appeal have been filed in appeals nos. 11-CV-297 and 11-CV-322, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CV-460 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 11-CV-297 and 11-CV-322 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
05/03/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court of the record index, for appeal no. 11-CV-460, in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX 11CV297
05/10/2011FiledRECORD INDEX 11cv460 & 11-CV-646
05/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/13/2011 It appearing that the complete records on appeal have been filed with this court, it is ORDEREd that appellants' briefs and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 22, 2011 (unopposed) (Fitzhugh,et al; Henneghan and Saucier)
06/23/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for extension of time to file the brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 22, 2011. (JAC) elp
07/19/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant Armstrong)Granted
07/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal (Appellant Armstrong) PENDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
10/27/2011FiledOrder directing appellants to submit the status statement accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
11/04/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 10/27/11, mailed to appellee Eric Fedewa at 421 Royal Tern Road S. Ponte Vedra Beach Fl, 32082-7223, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as with the following forwarding address 325 Sea Lake Ln Ponte Vedra, FL 32082-4756 and remailed to this address this date. elp (Appellee Fedewa)
11/10/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Appellant Fitzhugh)Granted
11/22/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeals (Appellant Fitzhugh, et al)Granted
12/09/2011FiledStatement regarding (Appellant Fitzhugh, et al)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Appellant Fitzhugh)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeals (Appellant Fitzhugh, et al)
12/09/2011FiledDismissed
12/14/2011FiledReceived Order dated 12/9/11, mailed to appellee Eric Fedewa at 421 Royal Tern Road S, Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-7223 and returned by the U.S. P.S. with the following forwarding address below: 325 N Sea Lake Ln, Ponte Vedra FL 32082-4756 and remailed to appellee at this address this date. elp (Appellee Fedewa)
12/30/2011FiledMandate