judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILLARD CONSTRUCTION VS. ADDISON, INC.

Case Information: 38462
Short Caption:GILLARD CONSTRUCTION VS. ADDISON, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A435222Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/21/2001 / Richitt, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15324
09/11/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days.
09/11/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days.
09/21/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Paul Richitt, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/16/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-19222
12/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 16, 2001, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. An appeal shall not be dismissed until the parties first "pay whatever fees are due." Appellant shall submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court within 7 days of the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. We defer ruling on the stipulation to dismiss this appeal, pending payment of the filing fee. 01-20859
12/20/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Peel firm -check no. 4630.
01/17/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 02-01133
01/17/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.