judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE LOUISE J. SARA IRREVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2003 v. JOSEPH D. SARA

Case Heading (S-10-0104)
Case Number:S-10-0104Case Docketed On:05/06/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE LOUISE J. SARA IRREVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2003 v. JOSEPH D. SARA
Full Title:AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE LOUISE J. SARA IRREVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2003, Appellant (Petitioner), v. JOSEPH D. SARA, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAmerican National BankHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppelleeJoseph D. SaraLucas Evan Buckley
Scott W. Meier

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts, Estates - Trusts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 9
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/06/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/23/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of Appellant American National Bank, Trustee of the Louise J. Sara Irrevocable Trust Dated March 14, 2003EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Harriet Hageman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lucas Buckley for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Harriet M. Hageman for appellant; Lucas Evan Buckley and Scott W. Meier, argument by Mr. Buckley for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/21/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 02/09/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal