judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGINALD WHITEHEAD JR. V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 11-AA-0456
Short Caption:REGINALD WHITEHEAD JR. V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01935-10Filed Date:04/14/2011

Opening Event Date:04/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerReginald Whitehead, Jr.YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/14/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
04/14/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/22/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to April 14, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/22/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
08/16/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ hearing of 9/22/10
08/16/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/25/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/12/2011FiledOrder directing petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to be submitted within 20 days
11/10/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
11/10/2011FiledDismissed
12/02/2011FiledMandate