judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES VS. MILLER

Case Information: 38445
Short Caption:JONES VS. MILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29391 , 38130
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A295490Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/13/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Laxalt & Nomura -check no. 12441.
09/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15248
09/10/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/13/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/21/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15953
09/24/2001Other Other. Mailed additional documents to Settlement Judge Lester H. Berkson.
02/15/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-03056
02/20/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-03279
02/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-03644
02/27/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.