judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHERRY LANE-WALTER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0087)
Case Number:S-10-0087Case Docketed On:04/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:SHERRY LANE-WALTER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:SHERRY LANE-WALTER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSherry Lane-WalterGeorge Santini
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 52
Citation:250 P.3d 513

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but NOA received with attachmentsNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/21/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - General IndexNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/26/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in the District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/04/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/28/2010Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
07/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/02/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/03/2010Correspondence - Incoming - Letter notifying that record had been mailedCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/04/2010Brief - Other - Replacement signature page with counsel's original signatureBriefOtherFinal
08/05/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/12/2010Motion - Oral argument - reassignment from expedited docketMotionOral argument - reassignment from brief only docketFinal
08/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Reassignment to Oral Argument DocketEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Response/Objection - Other - No response filedResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
08/31/2010Order - Granting reassignment to argument docketOrderGranting reassignment to argument docketFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - George Santini for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kelly Roseberry for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (George Santini for appellant; James Michael Causey, Sr. Assistant Attorney General, Kelly Roseberry, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Roseberry for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Hill writing for the Court, Justice Burke filed a special concurrence with Justice Voigt joining.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/24/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/25/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re costsEventPhone CallFinal
04/11/2011Response/Objection - CostsResponse/ObjectionCostsFinal
04/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/18/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal