judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILSON SPORTING GOODS COMPANY V. EDWIN W. HICKOX, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0445
Short Caption:WILSON SPORTING GOODS COMPANY V. EDWIN W. HICKOX, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1489-08Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/06/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/03/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilson Sporting Goods CompanyN
Megan A. WallaceNN
Andrew ButzYY
Keith M. BonnerNY
AppelleeEdwin W. Hickox N
Patrick M. ReganYY
AppelleeLisa A. Hickox N
Patrick M. ReganYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 6, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being order, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 3/8/11, 3/9/11, 3/10/11 & 3/11/11) (elp)
08/12/2011FiledRecord Index
08/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record#1 (207-pgs/johnson 3/8/11 proc.)
08/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2(208-444 pgs/johnson 3/9/11 proc.)
08/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (445-564 pgs/johnson 3/10/11 proc.)
08/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4 (565-581 pgs/johnson 3/11/11 proc.)w/cd
08/26/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/30/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/20/2011FiledOrder dated 8/30/11, mailed to counsel for appellant (Keith M. Bonner, Esquire, returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and remailed to the latest address on record. (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 9, 2011 (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledStatement Of Issues - and amended designation of parts of record for inclusion in joint briefing appendix (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 9, 2011 (Appellant
11/03/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
11/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Hickox)Granted
12/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Hickox)
01/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File 1 week Brief (Appellee Hickox)Granted
01/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File 1 week Brief (Appellee Hickox)
01/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellee Hickox)
02/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief to February 21, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
02/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief to February 21, 2012 and deferred joint appendix(Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledAppendix to reply brief (Appellant)
03/05/2012FiledBrief (final brief partial) (Appellant)
03/06/2012FiledBrief (final partial brief) (Appellee Hickox)
03/06/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/04/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/18/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/23/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Fisher,Oberly,McLeese, Andrew Butz Esq.,for appellant, Patrick M. Regan Esq.,for appellee.
11/02/2012FiledMotion for leave to supplement the record with a copy of an April 13, 2012 Complaint (see attachment) (Appellant)Denied
11/13/2012FiledOpposition to Motion for leave to supplement record (Appellee Hickox)
11/20/2012FiledReply to appellee's motion to supplement the record (Appellant)
01/31/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher, Oberly and McLeese, Associate Judges.)
02/07/2013FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee Hickox)Denied Without Prejudice
02/14/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
03/04/2013FiledORDER DENYING W/O PREJUDICE APPELLEES' MOTION FOR COSTS
03/26/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc
03/28/2013FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee Hickox)Granted
04/01/2013FiledTMC/MOTION FOR COSTS
04/03/2013FiledMandate
04/29/2013FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR COSTS in the AMOUNT OF $135.72