judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE DRYWALL VS. RANCHO DEL NORTE

Case Information: 38446
Short Caption:STATE DRYWALL VS. RANCHO DEL NORTECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39322
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A402594Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mead firm -check no. 01708.
09/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15251
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16206
09/27/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman.
10/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-16689
10/08/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman. (Response to Docketing Statement)
01/14/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-00959
01/25/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-01753
02/11/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-02674
04/25/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. 120 days requested. 02-07324
05/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation for and extension of time as a joint motion. We grant the motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by September 25, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-08509
06/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 02-10449
07/15/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response of Appellant State Drywall, Inc. to Order to Show Cause. 02-12080
07/29/2002MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response of Appellant State Drywall, Inc. to Order to Show Cause. 02-12959
08/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. We conclude that this appeal may proceed, and we reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-14581
11/22/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-20184
11/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 22, 2002. Appellant shall have until January 24, 2003, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-20304
01/23/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 03-01278
01/27/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 03-01392
01/27/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.