judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CODY LEIGH BRISTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0088)
Case Number:S-10-0088Case Docketed On:04/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CODY LEIGH BRISTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CODY LEIGH BRISTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCody Leigh BristerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/08/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/17/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/18/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/18/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal