judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ENGH VS. STATE, DENTAL EXAMINERS

Case Information: 34639
Short Caption:ENGH VS. STATE, DENTAL EXAMINERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A403236Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1999 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Curran & Parry--check no. 7680.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07302
08/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-10683
12/06/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-12189
01/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-00191
01/06/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.