judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHAWN M. HAYZLETT v. TIMOTHY L. HAYZLETT

Case Heading (S-07-0040)
Case Number:S-07-0040Case Docketed On:02/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:SHAWN M. HAYZLETT v. TIMOTHY L. HAYZLETT
Full Title:SHAWN M. HAYZLETT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TIMOTHY L. HAYZLETT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShawn M. Hayzlett Rice Pro Se
AppelleeTimothy L. HayzlettRichard Allen Erb Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 147
Citation:167 P.3d 639

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/28/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of defendant's objection to plaintiff's statement of evidence.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/10/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/17/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/01/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/01/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from clerk of district court indicating that although we have requested the record, the judge has a hearing scheduled for Thursday regarding a statement of the evidence pursuant to Rule 3.03. Told her to wait until record has been settled.EventPhone CallFinal
05/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Change of address (Shawn Rice) effective July 1, 2007.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
09/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/16/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal