judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VAUGHN, PAUL E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1120
Short Caption:VAUGHN, PAUL E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:80-CF-1120Consolidated: 82-CF-0597
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5454-79Filed Date:09/29/1980

Opening Event Date:09/29/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/02/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:03/03/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901VAUGHN, PAUL E. UNITED STATES
09/29/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/02/1981FiledRecord Completed
11/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
03/03/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/03/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition