judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WINSTON MANUEL PEREZ HERNANDEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 15-CM-0130
Short Caption:WINSTON MANUEL PEREZ HERNANDEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD13406-14Filed Date:02/02/2015

Opening Event Date:02/02/2015Case Status:Under Advisement
Record Completed:04/10/2015Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/19/2019
Argued/Submitted:12/17/2019
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:Ready to be Decided
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Loren L. AliKhanNY
John D. MartoranaNY
AppellantWinston M. Perez HernandezY
Samia FamNY
Alice WangYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Chrisellen R. KolbYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2015FiledNotice Of Appeal
02/20/2015FiledInitial Order
02/20/2015FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Lisa Resnikoff, Esquire (Appellant)
03/02/2015FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (rt ordered/needed)de
03/25/2015FiledRecord Copies
03/25/2015FiledRecord Index
04/10/2015FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (6 pages/tape) 8/19/14 proc
04/10/2015FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (13 pages/tape) 10/24/14 proc
04/10/2015FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (111 pages/tape) 1/9/15 proc
04/10/2015FiledSupplemental Record - #4 (34 pages/tape) 1/14/15 proc
04/10/2015FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (17 pages/tape) 1/29/15 proc
04/10/2015FiledRecord Completed
05/04/2015FiledBriefing Order
06/05/2015FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/10/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before June 29, 2015
06/29/2015FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/29/2015FiledAppendix attached to brief. (Appellant)
08/03/2015FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/03/2015FiledBriefing Completed
09/28/2015FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/06/2015FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/18/2015FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/03/2016FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/26/2016FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/29/2016FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to file the lodged reply brief.
08/29/2016FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/06/2016FiledMotion To Supplement The Record with attachments (Appellant)Granted
09/09/2016FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to supplement the record on appeal.
09/27/2016FiledArgued Before Associate Judges Fisher, Beckwith, and Easterly. (Lisa Schopler Resnikoff Esq.,for the appellant) (Ryan M. Malone Esq.,for the appellee).
09/30/2016FiledMotion To Supplement The Record with attached DVD (Appellant)
10/07/2016FiledAmended Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
07/06/2017FiledOrder Granting appellant's amended motion to submit correct video as supplemental record #6.
07/06/2017FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (DVD)
05/09/2019FiledReversed And Remanded by OPINION
05/09/2019FiledOrder Vacating the Opinions of the division of this court filed in this matter and directing parties to file supplemental briefs for consideration by the court sitting en banc.
05/13/2019FiledCounsel's Motion to Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
05/21/2019FiledOrder granting counsel's motion to withdraw and appointing Samia Fam, Esquire to represent appellant herein.
05/21/2019FiledOrder directing the parties to file supplemental briefs.
05/30/2019FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File supplemental brief (Appellant)Granted
06/06/2019FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Extension Of Time to File supplemental brief on or before July 22, 2019.
07/18/2019FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
07/18/2019LodgedSupplemental Appendix (Appellant)
07/18/2019FiledMotion To Supplement The Record with CD (Appellant)Granted
07/31/2019FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the attachment to appellant's motion as a supplemental appendix.
08/15/2019FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a Supplemental Brief (Appellee)
08/27/2019FiledOrder Granting appellee's Motion for Extension of time to file supplemental brief on or before September 19, 2019
09/19/2019FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/19/2019FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2019FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Amicus Curiae)Granted
10/07/2019FiledOrder Granting amicus curiae's Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to October 10, 2019.
10/07/2019FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant)Granted
10/07/2019FiledOrder granting MOET to file appellant's en banc reply brief.
10/10/2019FiledBrief (Amicus Curiae)
10/31/2019FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/31/2019FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/17/2019FiledArgued Before Chief Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges Glickman, Fisher, Thompson, Beckwith, Easterly, and McLeese. (Alice Wang Esq.,for the appellant) (Chrisellen K. Kolb Esq.,for the appellee).