judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUMLEY (KENNETH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38453
Short Caption:BRUMLEY (KENNETH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3675Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-15278
09/17/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 7, 2001. Court Reporter: Sheldon L. Hensley. 01-15682
10/25/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time to File Fast Track. 01-17994
11/01/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. filed October 25, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on October 25, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-18302
11/01/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17995
11/01/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-17996
12/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track response has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 01-21515
01/07/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-00380
02/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-02784
03/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02816
03/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/19/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2002. 02-02816