judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL DANA WILLIAMS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0095)
Case Number:S-10-0095Case Docketed On:04/28/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Courts (Title 5)
Short Title:PAUL DANA WILLIAMS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PAUL DANA WILLIAMS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul Dana Williams Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - "Request for Clarification of Record from and by the Third Judicial District Court"Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/14/2010Correspondence - Incoming - Copy of letter from Appellant to District Court ClerkCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/19/2010Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
05/27/2010Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
06/22/2010Order - Denying Petition for Reinstatement of AppealOrderDenyFinal
06/22/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal