judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHIRLEY BOLTON, ET AL V. KIRK LAW FIRM ET AL.

Case Information: 11-CV-0451
Short Caption:SHIRLEY BOLTON, ET AL V. KIRK LAW FIRM ET AL.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4292-10Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShirley BoltonNPro SeN
AppellantLinda BoltonNPro SeN
AppellantVickie E. NealNPro SeN
AppelleeKirk Law FirmN
William R. WilderYN
AppelleeDana Kirk N
William R. WilderYN
AppelleeF. Leighton Durham N
William R. WilderYN
Robert T. HallNN
Gobind S. SethiNN
AppelleeKirk Pittard N
Robert T. HallNN
William R. WilderYN
Gobind S. SethiNN
AppelleeDurham & Pittard Law FirmN
William R. WilderYN
Robert T. HallNN
Gobind S. SethiNN
AppelleeColleen A. Clark N
William R. WilderYN
Robert T. HallNN
Gobind S. SethiNN
AppelleeC.L. Schmidt N
Robert T. HallNN
Gobind S. SethiNN
William R. WilderYN
AppelleeMichael E. Schmidt N
William R. WilderYN
Robert T. HallNN
Gobind S. SethiNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 6, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and fileswith this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being order, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (for all aptlts) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED 9/17/10) (elp)
05/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (13-pgs/tape 9/17/10 proc.)w/cd
05/23/2011RECORD INDEX
05/24/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2(plaintiff's sealed exhibits 3-5, 9-13,23-25,32-50, 53-58,60 & 77 filed 6/9/10 )
05/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/21/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS and subsitution of counsel
06/21/2011APPEARANCE- of William R. Wilder on behalf of aple(Kirk Law Firm)
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8/12/11
07/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8/12/11 and Granting Walter Anderson, Esquire, Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellee
08/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to September 12, 2011 (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)Granted
08/30/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to September 12, 2011 (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellants the Boltons, Appellant Neal)
09/16/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the appendix within 15 days from the order accompanied by a motion for leave
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - a corrected/amended brief (Appellants Bolton, and Appellant Neal)Granted
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - appendix (Appellants Bolton and Appellant Neal)Granted
09/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File - a corrected/amended brief (Appellants Bolton and Appellant Neal and Motion For Leave to File - appendix (Appellants Bolton and Appellant Neal)
09/22/2011FiledBrief (corrected/amended) (Appellants Bolton, and Appellant Neal)
09/22/2011FiledAppendix (Appellants Bolton, and Appellant Neal)
10/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt)Granted
10/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt)Granted
11/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt) Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt)
11/22/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt)
11/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - reply brief until January 13, 2012 (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)Granted
12/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File - reply brief until January 13, 2012 (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief for 14 days. Reply Brief (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/27/2012FiledMotion to supplement documents as exhibits with appellants reply brief (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)Granted
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/03/2012WithdrawnMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt)Withdrawn
02/07/2012FiledMotion to withdraw motion to postpone oral argument (Appellee Clark, Appellee Durham, Appellee Durham & Pittard Law Firm, Appellee Kirk, Appellee Kirk Law Firm, Appellee Pittard, Appellee Schmidt)Granted
02/09/2012FiledOrder Granting appellees' motion to withdraw motion to postpone oral argument.
02/23/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant Bolton, Appellant Neal)
02/23/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's pro se motion to file reply brief.
03/05/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Atty Wilder (Appellee)
03/15/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Thompson, Reid
08/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
09/19/2012FiledMandate