judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BASILE S. DASKALAKIS v. WILLIAM B. RESOR, BARBARA HAUGE, LANCE JOHNSON, ROBERT WRIGHTMAN, JOHN RESOR, SNAKE RIVER RANCH LLC, SNAKE RIVER ASSOCIATES, L.P., and CRYSTAL SPRINGS RANCH, INC.

Case Heading (S-10-0094)
Case Number:S-10-0094Case Docketed On:04/27/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BASILE S. DASKALAKIS v. WILLIAM B. RESOR, BARBARA HAUGE, LANCE JOHNSON, ROBERT WRIGHTMAN, JOHN RESOR, SNAKE RIVER RANCH LLC, SNAKE RIVER ASSOCIATES, L.P., and CRYSTAL SPRINGS RANCH, INC.
Full Title:BASILE S. DASKALAKIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WILLIAM B. RESOR, BARBARA HAUGE, LANCE JOHNSON, ROBERT WRIGHTMAN, JOHN RESOR, SNAKE RIVER RANCH LLC, SNAKE RIVER ASSOCIATES, L.P., and CRYSTAL SPRINGS RANCH, INC., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBasile S. Daskalakis Pro Se
AppelleeWilliam B. ResorMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeBarbara HaugeMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeLance JohnsonMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeRobert WrightmanMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeJohn ResorMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeSnake River Ranch LLCMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeSnake River Associates LPMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeCrystal Springs Ranch, Inc.Matthew E. Turner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 132
Citation:239 P.3d 648

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/27/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA with proper attachments receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/27/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/03/2010Event - Phone Call - Appellant re caption, he believes that certain parties were left out. Recommended that he file a motion to amend caption.EventPhone CallFinal
05/05/2010Correspondence - Outgoing - Notice that original and six copies of pleadings are required.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
05/05/2010Motion - Amend CaptionMotionAmendFinal
05/25/2010Order - Denying Motion to Amend Caption (Copy of Order Sent to Counsel for parties rejected as Appellees)OrderDenyFinal
06/03/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/12/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' brief; and received copy of brief on cd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/29/2010Event - Phone Call - received call from district court clerk indicating that neither party had done a designation of record. She will send letter to that effect.EventPhone CallFinal
07/29/2010Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee. He will do designation.EventPhone CallFinal
07/30/2010Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from district court clerk indicating that neither party has designated record.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/02/2010Order - Sanction - designation of record - Order sanctioning counsel for appellee and directing parties to file designation of record.OrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
08/06/2010Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
08/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/18/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/18/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal