judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NABOR (AMADOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38452
Short Caption:NABOR (AMADOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 30785
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C136202Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/28/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-15276
09/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 01-15694
10/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 01-16816
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38403/38429/38431/38452/38474/38476. 01-17810
01/28/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 7. 02-01812
01/28/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-20012
12/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-20361
12/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/30/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 19, 2002. 02-20361