judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-94-00082-CR
08-94-00082-CR
04/05/1994
Other Felony
Garcia, Arturo
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/1996Mandate Issued
01/22/1996Shuck purged
01/22/1996Mandate Issued
12/28/1995Fee paid
12/19/1995Fee paid
12/18/1995Fee paid
12/14/1995Fee paid
12/11/1995Fee paid
12/04/1995Fee paid
12/04/1995Fee paid
11/27/1995Fee paid
11/22/1995Case reinstated
11/22/1995JUDGMENT WITHDRAWN
11/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/22/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
11/22/1995Opinion Withdrawn
11/22/1995Payment of fee due requested
11/22/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
11/22/1995Submission
11/22/1995Submitted
11/22/1995Case reinstated
11/17/1995Fee paid
11/15/1995Fee paid
11/09/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/06/1995Fee paid
11/06/1995Fee paid
10/26/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
10/26/1995Payment of fee due requested
10/26/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
09/29/1995Submitted
09/29/1995Submission
09/29/1995Submitted
07/26/1995Submission
06/27/1995Brief Filed
06/27/1995Case ready to be set
06/27/1995Case ready to be set
06/14/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/1995Order entered
05/30/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/26/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/01/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/18/1995Brief Filed
01/18/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/16/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/14/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/29/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/05/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/05/1994Transcript Filed
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/22/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasHon. Jaime E. Esparza
Garcia, ArturoCriminal - AppellantHon. M. Clara Hernandez
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Guadalupe Rivera
70385-168
60 Yrs. run c/c