judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00315-CR
14-94-00315-CR
04/04/1994
Other Drug Possession
Torres, Raymond AKA Torres, Raymond Avalos
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/14/1996Case stored
05/01/1996Mandate due to be issued
05/01/1996Mandate Issued
05/01/1996Mandate Issued
04/16/1996Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
01/22/1996Petition for discretionary review due
01/22/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/05/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
01/05/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
12/21/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/21/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/19/1995Submitted
12/19/1995Submission
12/19/1995Submitted
01/20/1995State's brief DUE
01/17/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/17/1995Case ready to be set
01/17/1995Case ready to be set
12/22/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/16/1994State's brief DUE
12/14/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/09/1994Appellant's brief DUE
12/01/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
11/21/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/18/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/18/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/17/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/14/1994Appellant's brief DUE
11/09/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/20/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/10/1994Appellant's brief DUE
10/10/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/09/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/08/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/31/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/04/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/01/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/09/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/01/1994No description available.
05/31/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/27/1994Transcript FILED
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/29/1994Date of Sentence
03/29/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/01/1996Case StoredCase stored
05/02/2017Case StoredCase archived
05/18/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasKimberly Aperauch Stelter
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantKristine C. Woldy
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
681016
40 yrs. TDC