judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0312
94-0312
04/04/1994
App Writ of Error
PROPERTY TAX ANALYSTS INC.
JONATHAN JONES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/18/1994Reply to ResponseRespondentCOA Brief - Ape Briefs
04/04/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/06/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/02/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
04/21/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/18/1994Reply to ResponseCOA Brief - Ape Briefs
04/04/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/06/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PROPERTY TAX ANALYSTS, INC.PetitionerMr. John Brusniak Jr.
JONES, JONATHANRespondentMr. Kenneth Byford
Court of Appeals Information:
05-93-00390-CV
Reversed & Rendered
RULE 90, 01-27-94
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JAMES A. BAKER
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
Dallas
Honorable Charles Stokes
CC90-12313-E