judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00319-CR
14-94-00319-CR
04/04/1994
Burglary
Jackson, Frederick
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/24/1995Case stored
04/11/1995Mandate Issued
04/11/1995Mandate Issued
03/27/1995Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/19/1994Petition for discretionary review due
12/19/1994Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/17/1994Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
11/04/1994Motion for rehearing DUE
11/04/1994Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
10/20/1994Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/20/1994Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/19/1994Submitted
10/19/1994Submission
10/19/1994Submitted
10/04/1994Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
09/22/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/22/1994Case ready to be set
09/22/1994Case ready to be set
09/06/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/04/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/27/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/18/1994Hearing Record FILED
07/14/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/08/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/28/1994Past due brief
06/10/1994No description available.
05/26/1994Record Filed (Both records FILED)
05/18/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/30/1994Date of Sentence
03/30/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/11/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasMary Lou Keel
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWinston E. Cochran, Jr.
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
Honorable GEORGE H. GODWIN
676078
35 yrs. TDC