judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0310
94-0310
04/04/1994
Second App Writ Error
HARRY S. SCALING TRUSTEE ET AL.
SOUTHWESTERN GAS PIPELINE INC. ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/26/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerBehalf of Georgia Vandervoort; Notice of adoption of co-appellees' app writ of errorSequence #: 02
04/18/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/04/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerBehalf of Harry S. Scaling Et Al.Sequence #: 01
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/06/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/02/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedTwo applications for writ of error denied.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/02/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedTwo applications for writ of error denied.Of Harry Scaling
06/02/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedOf Georgia Vandervoort
04/26/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledBehalf of Georgia Vandervoort; Notice of adoption of co-appellees' app writ of errorSequence #: 02
04/21/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/20/1994Notice requesting filing fee$10 for Mo/to adopt application for writ of error to Gary DeShazo
04/18/1994Reply to Response
04/04/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledBehalf of Harry S. Scaling Et Al.Sequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/06/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CARTER FOUNDATIONPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
OWSLEY, JACKPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
MCLAUGHLIN, BLANE E.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
SANKARY, EDWARD M.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
WHITE, LARRY B.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
PENSARELI, INC.PetitionerMr. Russell R. Barton
LEIB, DOROTHY N.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
LAUGHLIN, GARY B.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
LANGFORD, SHERRYPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
DUNNAGAN, JAMES R.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
LUSKEY, ALVINPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
STRAND, LAVERNEPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
MALONE, MABLEPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
SUNBELT EXPLORATION INC.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
V-LTD.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
MALONE, JAMES D.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
BOWIE, W. FRANKPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
SOUTHWESTERN GAS PIPELINE, INCRespondentMr. Ralph K. Harrison
Mr. Thomas P. Battle
KRUSE, OPHAGPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
HOLLADAY, S. DAVIDPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
MICALLEF, A.M.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
O.K. BUILDINGPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
VANDERVOORT, GEORGIA H.PetitionerMr. Gary F. DeShazo
MINTON, ELLISPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
WHITE, ROBERT A.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
B & H INVESTMENT COMPANYPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
WATSON, ROBERT A.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
MCMACKIN, JOHN W.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
LEWIS, CHARLES E.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
LUSKEY, LOUISPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
FERGUSON, GEORGE E.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
BARNEY CHAPMAN, INC.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
GRIMM, LOIS A.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
HIGHGATE, ROBERT T.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
LUSKEY, HENRYPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
SCALING, HARRY S.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
MCCLANE, JOHN B.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
BAMBERGER, CHARLESPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
CHAPMAN, I.B.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
FERGUSON, ROBERT A.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
ROBIN, JERRYPetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
BENSON, BEN N.PetitionerMr. Russell R. Barton
GRIMM, JACK W.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
BAILEY, JR., FRANK A.PetitionerMr. Andrew D. Sims
GRIFFIN, B.D.PetitionerMr. Bill F. Bogle
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00011-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Rend'd
870 SW2d 180, 01-18-94
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
236th District Court
Tarrant
236-124500-89