judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00556-CV
05-94-00556-CV
04/04/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Employment Commission, et al
Jess R. Buckalew
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/2016Order enteredDestroy
08/13/2015Letter issued by the court
08/22/1997Mandate Issued
08/22/1997Mandate Issued
06/25/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/04/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/05/1995Motion to Withdraw Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/1995Motion to Withdraw Attorney
05/02/1995Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1995Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
04/17/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/17/1995Motion for Rehearing Tendered
03/30/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
03/30/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
12/14/1994Submission
12/14/1994Submitted
12/14/1994Submission
12/14/1994Submitted
11/30/1994Submission
11/03/1994MattConv
10/12/1994MattConv
06/16/1994Brief Filed
06/16/1994Case ready to be set
06/16/1994Case ready to be set
06/06/1994Brief Filed
05/25/1994Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/25/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/25/1994Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/24/1994Response to Motion
05/20/1994Response to Motion
05/12/1994Response to Motion
05/11/1994Motion for Leave to File
05/05/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/28/1994Motion for Extension to File Response - DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1994Motion for Extension to File Response Filed
04/18/1994Motion for Leave to File
04/07/1994Motion for Leave to File
04/04/1994Transcript Filed
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/01/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/02/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jess R. BuckalewAppelleeJess R. Buckalew
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Lana B Rolf
92-00180-E