judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00326-CV
01-94-00326-CV
04/04/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Havens, Charles H.
James W. Ayers
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/24/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/14/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/29/1994Date final opinion release for publication
10/20/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/20/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/20/1994Submitted
09/20/1994Submission
09/20/1994Submitted
08/25/1994Supplemental brief filed
07/19/1994Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
07/19/1994Submission
06/23/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
06/23/1994Case ready to be set
06/23/1994Case ready to be set
06/16/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
06/16/1994Supplemental transcript filed
06/02/1994Motion for leave to file strans
06/02/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/23/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/29/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
04/18/1994Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
04/04/1994Transcript filed
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/11/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/24/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeStephen D. Ingram
StateAppellee
StateAppellantJames Cooper-Hill
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
91-54167A