judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-94-00079-CV
08-94-00079-CV
04/04/1994
Automobile Personal Injury
Allstate Insurance Company
White, Billie R. (Billie Matz)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/09/2016Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/01/1995Mandate Issued
02/01/1995Shuck purged
02/01/1995Mandate Issued
10/06/1994Judgment IssuedDismissed
10/06/1994Judgment IssuedDismissed
10/05/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/28/1994JUDGMENT WITHDRAWN
07/28/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/1994Order entered
07/27/1994Judgment IssuedDismissed
07/27/1994Miscellaneous Motion Filed
04/14/1994Fee paid
04/04/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/04/1994Payment of fee due requested
04/04/1994Transcript Filed
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WHITE, BILLIE R. (BILLIE MATZ)AppelleeHon. Blake W. Barrow
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANYAppellantHon. Jeffrey W. McElroy
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam M. Paxson
90-9301