judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00333-CR
01-94-00333-CR
04/04/1994
Assault & battery
Tartt, Richard Leon Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/09/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/09/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/17/1996Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/02/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/15/1996Submission
04/15/1996Submitted
02/12/1996Submission
01/22/1996Brief Due
01/02/1996Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
01/02/1996Case ready to be set
01/02/1996Case ready to be set
12/21/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/08/1995Brief Due
12/08/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/13/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/11/1995Brief Due
10/19/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/02/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/26/1995Brief due for retained counsel
08/11/1995Brief Due
07/27/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/13/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/13/1995Brief due for retained counsel
05/13/1995Brief Due
04/20/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/23/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/07/1995Brief due for retained counsel
01/28/1995Brief Due
12/29/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/14/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/26/1994Brief due for retained counsel
09/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/25/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/22/1994Brief due for retained counsel
05/19/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/19/1994Statement of facts filed
05/12/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/04/1994Transcript filed
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/09/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Guarino
StateCriminal - AppellantConnie B. Williams
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
Honorable Allen L. Stilley
93CR1320
1 year