judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00326-CV
14-94-00326-CV
04/05/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Samuel, Harry L. and Samuel, Dorietha
Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/29/1994Case stored
08/29/1994Mandate Issued
08/29/1994Mandate Issued
07/29/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
07/14/1994Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
07/14/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
07/14/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
07/13/1994Submitted
07/13/1994Submission
07/13/1994Submitted
07/01/1994Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
04/05/1994Transcript FILED
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1994Bond FILED
01/13/1994Motion for new trial FILED
12/14/1993Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantSteven Joseph Kherkher
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantRichard N. Countiss
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeKevin F. Risley
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. William J. Cozort, Jr.
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable SCOTT REITER LINK
89-54378