judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SULLIVAN VS. SULLIVAN

Case Information: 38255
Short Caption:SULLIVAN VS. SULLIVANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D260797Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/06/2001 / Elliott-Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dickerson, Dickerson, Consul & Pocker--check no. 6741.
08/01/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12987
08/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Decision & Order filed 7/13/01 (incomplete copy was included w/documents submitted to this office). Due Date: 10 days
08/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Decision and Order filed in district court on July 13, 2001. 01-13406
08/16/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13937
08/20/2001Other Other. Mailed additional document (docketing statement) to Settlement Judge Jennifer Elliott-Tavano.
10/25/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 10, 2001. 01-18000
12/07/2001MotionFiled Motion. Respondent Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. 01-20607
12/12/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jennifer Elliott-Tavano.
12/12/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 18, 2001. 01-20885
01/30/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-01996
03/28/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Reinstating Briefing and Granting Motion. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2). On December 7, 2001, counsel for respondent, attorney James J. Jimmerson, filed a motion to withdraw from representing respondent. We grant Mr. Jimmerson's motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The clerk of this court shall amend the docket to reflect the fact that Mr. Jimmerson is no longer counsel of record for respondent Jill Sullivan. Respondent shall retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file notice of appearance with this court within 60 days or inform this court in writing within the same time period if she will not be retaining new counsel. If Ms. Sullivan does not retain new counsel or otherwise communicate with this court within the 60-day period, this appeal shall be submitted for decision on appellant's opening brief and appendix. 02-05474
04/19/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/6/01, 6/28/01, 6/29/01. To Court Reporter: Family Court Transcript Services. 02-06969
05/16/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/06/01; 06/28/01, Vols. 1 and 2 and 06/29/01. Court Reporter: Michele Phelps. 02-08692
06/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-11058
07/19/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-12412
07/19/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.