judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODERICK V. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1436
Short Caption:RODERICK V. THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-4467-10Filed Date:11/17/2010

Opening Event Date:11/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoderick V. Thomas Y
James E. DrewYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kevin A. Chambers YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James E. Drew, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) James E. Drew, Esquire
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (92 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/8/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (251 pgs/Hawkins) 6/14/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (252-482 pgs/Hawkins) 6/15/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (483-730 pgs/Hawkins) 6/16/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (731-886 pgs/Hawkins) 6/17/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (887-906 pgs/Hawkins) 6/18/10 proc. w/cd
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (SEALED pleadings)
12/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/7/11. no oppo
02/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. (JAC)
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4 days. no oppo
03/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/14/11
03/14/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
03/14/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx
03/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix of appellant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed w/in 30 days from the date of the order. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/21/2011LIMITED APPENDIX
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (29 pgs/Johnson) 6/10/10 proc. w/cd
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 5/20/11 no oppo
04/29/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 20, 2011. (JAC)
05/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/20/11. no oppo
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
06/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/26/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Thompson, Belson
02/09/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
03/02/2012FiledMandate