judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT JAMES HULSY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0257)
Case Number:S-08-0257Case Docketed On:12/08/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:ROBERT JAMES HULSY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT JAMES HULSY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert James HulsyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 81
Citation:209 P.3d 901

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/26/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny L. Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/08/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folders & Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counselk for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/9/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal