judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JACKIE PRESTEGORD, ET VIR v. JAMES C. GLENN, M.D.

Case: B-1326
B-1326
01/20/1969
Application for Writ of Error
JACKIE PRESTEGORD, ET VIR
JAMES C. GLENN, M.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/02/1969Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/29/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/20/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/30/1969Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
05/07/1969Opinion issued
04/02/1969Brief on the Merits
04/02/1969Motion to dismiss
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/29/1969Response to Petition
01/20/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/20/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jackie Prestegord, et virPetitioner
James C. Glenn, M.D.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information