judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00309-CV
14-94-00309-CV
04/04/1994
Divorce
McNulty, Stephen Reynolds
McNulty, Cherri Ann
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/25/1994Case stored
07/25/1994Mandate Issued
07/25/1994Mandate Issued
06/24/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
06/09/1994Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
06/09/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/09/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/08/1994Submitted
06/08/1994Submission
06/08/1994Submitted
05/26/1994Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
05/05/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
04/20/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/18/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
04/04/1994Transcript FILED
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/15/1994Bond FILED
12/27/1993Motion for new trial FILED
12/15/1993Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Dwayne L. Mason
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeR. C. Stevenson
Trial Court Information
300th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable ANTHONY WILLY
93B2684