judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00070-CV
06-94-00070-CV
04/05/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Able Supply Company, Et Al
The Honorable B.D. Moye, Judge, 76th Judicial District Court, Morris County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/22/1994Motion to File DispOverruled
04/22/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
04/21/1994Response to Motion
04/18/1994REPLY FILED
04/06/1994LETTER
04/05/1994Holding for Record
04/05/1994Motion for leave to file
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/22/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Minnesota Mining Mfg. Co.,etalAppellantHon. Howard Waldrop
A. P. Green ServicesAppellantHon. Joe Michael Russell
American Exo-chemicalAppellantHon. Lawrence R. Maxwell
Moye, B. D.Attorney for IntervenorHon. B. D. Moye
General Portland, Inc., Et AlAppellantHon. Hubert A. Crouch III
Able Supply Co., Et AlAppellantRobert M. Martin Jr.
Infilco Degremont, Inc., Et AlAppellantHon. Jerry C. Parker
Lincoln Electric Company,et AlAppellantHon. James E. Cowles
General Electric Company,et AlAppellantHon. Mark K. Sales
Colt Industries CrucibleAppellantHon. Richard Riehl
Capital Wire & Cable Corp.AppellantL. Hayes Fuller III
National Nickel Alloy CorpAppellantC. Victor Haley
Pittsburgh Corning CorporationAppellantHon. R. Lyn Stevens
Ampco Metals, A/k/a A/k/aAppellantHon. Jeff Shaver
Carborundum Company, Et AlAppellantHon. Annalee Mathis
Sherritt Gordon MinesAppellantHon. John C. Hardy
Sumitomo Metal America, Inc.AppellantHon. Thomas B. Taylor
Holman Boiler Works, Inc.AppellantHon. Richard F. Jacobs
Aaron, Jr., PaulAppelleeHon. Walter Umphrey
Hon. Harold W. Nix
Hon. Franklin Jones Jr.
Trial Court Information
Honorable E. Paul Banner