judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0314
94-0314
04/05/1994
APPEAL REGARDING ATTORNEY DISCIPLINARY ACTION
IN THE MATTER OF CARLTON R. STEWART
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal filedDisciplinary AppealCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/05/1994Disciplinary Appeal filedDisciplinary Appeal
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/29/1994Case Stored
09/01/1994Motion to dismiss disposedOverruledSTATE BAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION O/R
09/01/1994Disciplinary Appeal disposedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed
08/24/1994Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorSTATE BAR OF TX MO/DISM F/WANT OF PROSECUTION
07/06/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/25/1994Case Record Filed
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal filedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/05/1994Disciplinary Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/29/1994Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stewart, Carlton R.AppellantMr. Carlton R. Stewart
BOARD OF DISCIPLINARY APPEALSAppelleeMr. Thomas H. Watkins
STATE BAR OF TEXASAppelleeMs. Dawn M. Evans
Ms. Linda Acevedo
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information