judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00056-CR
10-94-00056-CR
04/05/1994
Robbery
Reginald Watson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/1995Case stored
05/15/1995Mandate issued by this Court
03/29/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1995Submitted
01/25/1995Submission
01/03/1995Submission
12/15/1994Case ready to be set
12/15/1994No Description Available.
10/26/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
10/05/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
09/22/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
06/08/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/03/1994No Description Available.
06/03/1994No Description Available.
06/03/1994No Description Available.
04/05/1994No Description Available.
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/2095Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Watson, ReginaldAppellantJohn W. Williford Jr.
Hon. Hal R. Ridley
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasTuck Moody McLain
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Madison
Honorable Erwin G. Ernst
9097
99yrs.