judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAFFEJIAN VS. CHRISTENSEN C/W 38133

Case Information: 38254
Short Caption:CAFFEJIAN VS. CHRISTENSEN C/W 38133Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 38133 *, 38254Related Case(s): 38133
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401598Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2001 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/22/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Sylvester & Polednak, Ltd.--check no. 1668.
08/01/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12982
08/08/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14016
08/20/2001Other Other. Mailed additional document (docketing statement) to Settlement Judge Nathaniel J. Reed.
08/27/2001MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Separate Appeals taken in Same Action. Nos. 38133 and 38254. 01-14493
09/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-15976
10/02/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We grant respondent's unopposed motion to consolidate the above-entitled appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of these appeals. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 38133/38254. (01-16544)
10/18/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 26, 2001 and July 12, 2001. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. Nos. 38133/38254 (01-17573).
10/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Nos. 38133/38254 (01-17778).
11/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 26, 2001 and July 12, 2001. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. Nos. 38133/38254 (01-18835).
11/14/2001MotionFiled Motion. Attorney Jeffrey R. Sylvester. Nos. 38133/38254 (01-18956)
11/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for motion to withdraw. Nos. 38133/38254 (01-19366)
03/06/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Appeals. Nos. 38133/38254 (02-04108)
03/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On November 14, 2001, attorney Jeffrey R. Sylvester filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants in these consolidated appeals. There has been no opposition submitted by appellants or by respondent to the motion to withdraw. We grant the motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Alternatively, appellants shall inform this court in writing within the same time period if they will not be retaining new counsel. Failure to respond to this order may result in these appeals proceeding as proper person appeal. Filing deadlines are vacated pending further order of this court. Nos. 38133/38254. (02-04314)
03/29/2002Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. In response to our Order of March 11, 2002. Nos. 38133/38254 (02-05683).
04/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 11, 2002, this court entered an order granting the motion of attorney Jeffrey R. Sylvester to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants in these consolidated appeals. That order directed appellant to retain new counsel and to cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance, and suspended the briefing schedule in these appeals. In light of that order we deny, as moot, respondent's motion to dismiss these appeals due to appellant's failure to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. On March 29, 2002, appellants responded to our order, informing this court that they would not be retaining counsel to represent them in these appeals. Accordingly, these appeals shall proceed as proper person appeals. All filing deadlines are suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 38133/38254. (02-06824)
06/21/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn2[NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings).] fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38133/38254. (02-10764)
07/22/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 6. Nos. 38133/38254 (02-12576).
07/22/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 38133/38254.
10/15/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer. Upon reviewing the record, it appears that the district court may have abused its discretion in awarding respondent attorney fees without stating a basis for the award. Accordingly, respondent shall have 30 days from this order's date to demonstrate why the attorney fee award should not be reversed and the case remanded for further proceedings. Nos. 38133/38254. (03-18544) 03-17164
11/06/2003MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. (Answer) Nos. 38133/38254 (03-18556).
12/15/2003MotionReceived Proper Person Response. Response to Answer. Nos. 38133/38254. (03-20816)
04/08/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding. We consolidated these appeals and alter ordered respondent to address whether the district court abused its discretion in awarding attorney fees without stating a basis for the award. On November 6, 2003, respondent filed a response. "We reverse the district court's order granting attorney fees, and we remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn7[Although appellants were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from appellants.] Nos. 38133/3854. 04-06528
05/04/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07245
05/04/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/13/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 6, 2004. 04-07245