judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENRY CERRANO-DELEON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1435
Short Caption:HENRY CERRANO-DELEON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-25792-09Filed Date:11/17/2010

Opening Event Date:11/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHenry Cerrano-Deleon Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. MannarinoNY
Ademuyiwa BamiduroYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Andrew Szekely, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Andrew Szekely, Esquire
12/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/14/2010RECEIVED - copy of motion for transcript
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (26 pgs/Tape - 5/20/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (11 pgs/Tape - 7/16/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (12 pgs/Tape - 8/2/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7 pgs/Tape - 8/12/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (54 pgs/Tape - 10/15/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (12 pgs/Tape - 10/29/10 proc.) w/cd
01/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/20/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castilo)
01/25/2011RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011RECORD COPIES
02/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF of 40 days (no oppo).
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 11, 2011. (JAC)
04/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/07/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
05/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. NO OPPO
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 9, 2011. (JAC)
06/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 12, 2011 (no oppo)
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 12, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
07/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed by Appellee
07/29/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2012FiledSubmitted To Judge Beckwith,Oberly,Terry
10/24/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) Oberly and Beckwith, Assoicate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge)
11/07/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledMandate