judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00310-CV
14-94-00310-CV
04/04/1994
Contract
Insurance Co. of North America and Waite Hill Services, Inc.
Morris, John W., Red, Rebecca S., Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1997Petition for Review Disposed.GRANTED
10/20/1997Petition for Review Disposed.GRANTED
10/31/1996No description available.
10/28/1996Mandate due to be issued
10/17/1996Writ of Error FILED
10/14/1996No description available.
10/14/1996Writ of error DUE
09/12/1996Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
07/22/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
07/22/1996Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
07/05/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
07/03/1996Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/28/1996Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
06/20/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/20/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/02/1996Reply Brief Filed
12/07/1995Motion to strike DISPOSED - ANT, APE, STAOVERRULED
12/06/1995Submitted
12/06/1995Submission
12/06/1995Submitted
12/04/1995Motion to Strike FILED - ANT, APE, STA
11/29/1995Reply Brief Filed
11/01/1995Submission
12/01/1994Exhibits FILED
12/01/1994Mtn.Lv.file exhibits DISPOSED - ANT, APEGRANTED
12/01/1994No description available.
11/18/1994Mtn.Lv. file exhibits FILED - ANT, APE
11/18/1994Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE
11/18/1994Supplemental transcript DUE
11/15/1994Appellee's brief DUE
11/15/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/15/1994Case ready to be set
11/15/1994Case ready to be set
11/14/1994No description available.
11/14/1994No description available.
10/27/1994Motion as to brief length DISPOSED-APP,STAGRANTED
10/27/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
10/24/1994Appellee's brief DUE
10/20/1994Motion to amend transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
10/20/1994No description available.
10/17/1994Motion as to brief length FILED-APP,STA
10/17/1994Motion to amend transcript FILED-ANT,APE
10/12/1994Motion to amend transcript FILED-ANT,APE
09/29/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/15/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/28/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/22/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/07/1994Motion to amend transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEOVERRULED
07/07/1994Mtn.ext.time file response DISPOSED-ANT,APE,OVERRULED
07/07/1994Order Entered
07/01/1994Motion to amend transcript FILED-ANT,APE
07/01/1994Motion to extend time to file response FILED
06/28/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/27/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/23/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/16/1994Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
06/08/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/06/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/20/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
04/21/1994Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
04/05/1994Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
04/04/1994Transcript FILED
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/25/1994Bond FILED
01/04/1994Motion for new trial FILED
12/06/1993Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantDavid C. Mattka
MORRIS, JOHN W.AppelleeJames E. Doyle
Andrew R. Harvin
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantMichael Kevin Queenan
INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICAAppellantLisa D. Stewart
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
87-27388