judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0359-94
PD-0359-94
04/05/1994
PDR Case Type
BRADFORD, ELIJAH, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/06/1994FINAL DISPRefused
04/20/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/20/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/06/1994PDR FILED
04/05/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateCappy Eads
BRADFORD, ELIJAHJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Elijah Bradford, Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
03-93-00627-CR
AFF 3-23-94
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
264th District Court
Bell
Honorable JOE CARROLL
42,436