judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00201-CR
04-94-00201-CR
04/04/1994
Other Drug Possession
Brown, Ronald Ellis
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/2016Internal memo
01/09/1996Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/03/1996Mandate Issued
01/03/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
01/03/1996Mandate Issued
11/22/1995Higher Court DecisionRefused
11/02/1995Information regarding cause received
11/01/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/29/1995Petition for Review Filed
08/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/14/1995Submitted
03/14/1995Submission
03/14/1995Submitted
01/31/1995Submission
12/13/1994Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/10/1994Case ready to be set
11/10/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1994Case ready to be set
11/08/1994Response to Motion Filed
11/07/1994Brief Filed
11/02/1994Motion for Reconsideration Filed
10/19/1994Motion to Amend DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1994Order Entered
10/06/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/15/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/15/1994Motion to Amend Filed
09/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/16/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1994Brief Filed
08/01/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/01/1994No Description Available.
06/07/1994Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1994Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
05/09/1994No Description Available.
05/09/1994No Description Available.
05/06/1994No Description Available.
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/08/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/2021RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
05/22/2018Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Ronald EllisINTERESTED PARTY
Brown, Ronald EllisCriminal - AppellantJohn F. Carroll
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasBarbara Hervey
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Phil Chavarria, Jr.
93-CR-4427
7 years Probated 7 years