judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8484
A-8484
06/26/1961
Application for Writ of Error
M. W. LEE
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/30/1961Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/25/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/19/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1962Opinion issued
11/02/1961Miscellaneous letter
10/31/1961Motion for leave to file brief
10/30/1961Response to Brief filed
10/25/1961Supplemental Brief filed
10/03/1961Document received (See Remarks)
07/19/1961Response to Petition
06/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/26/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. W. LeePetitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information