judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8490
A-8490
06/29/1961
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK SPRIGGS, ET UX.
LOUIS GALE, DBA GALE BUILDERS SUPPLY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/21/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/14/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/07/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/29/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/21/1961Response to Petition
07/14/1961Response to Petition
07/07/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/29/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank Spriggs, et ux.Petitioner
Louis Gale, dba Gale Builders Supply CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information