judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8488
A-8488
06/28/1961
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF DALLAS
TOM H. SHARP
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/10/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/15/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/13/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/13/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/28/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/1962Response to Motion filed
08/22/1962Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing
08/10/1962Motion for Rehearing
07/26/1962Dissenting opinion issued.
07/26/1962Opinion issued
01/10/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1961Motion for Rehearing
09/15/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/13/1961Response to Petition
07/13/1961Response to Petition
06/28/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/28/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
First Federal Savings and Loan Association of DallasPetitioner
Texas Savings and Loan LeagueAmicus Curiae
Tom H. SharpRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information