judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIZE (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38275
Short Caption:MIZE (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40558 , 46537 , 46549 , 47014 , 47479 , 48160
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C114191Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13277
08/15/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/08/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 8/14/01 Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. Due Date: 10 days
10/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order appealed from filed in district court on: August 14, 2001. 01-17535
11/20/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38275, 38334, 38364, 38412, 38415, 38472. 01-19440
03/25/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 02-05284
03/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/31/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-09532
06/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09598
06/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2002. 02-09598