judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8556
A-8556
07/06/1961
Application for Writ of Error
H. B. HACKLEMAN, W. B. CARTER, H. B. HACKLEMAN AND W. B. CARTER
A. R. MCHANEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/17/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/05/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/06/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/30/1961Response to Motion filed
10/17/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/05/1961Response to Petition
07/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/26/1961Document received (See Remarks)
07/06/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. B. CarterPetitioner
H. B. HacklemanPetitioner
A. R. McHaneyRespondent
H. B. Hackleman and W. B. CarterPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information