judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5531
B-5531
09/15/1975
Application for Writ of Error
LANA VONNE SHARP, ET AL.
G. C. STACY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/10/1976Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/06/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1976Opinion issued
02/10/1976Response to Brief filed
02/06/1976Supplemental Brief filed
11/26/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1975Document received (See Remarks)
09/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lana Vonne Sharp, et al.Petitioner
G. C. Stacy, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information